CA SB1353 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 8257.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homeless population census information: collection and reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3435.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19 in HUMAN S. pending receipt. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HUMAN S., and HOUSING. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8257.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |