CA SB1353 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 832.7 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officer records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-23 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-22 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-19 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 832.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |