CA SB1351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - April 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 89296 to, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 89580) to Chapter 5 of Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State University: reports: management policies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateApril 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code89296New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback