CA SB135 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 51206.3 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: media literacy: model curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB135 Dodd et al (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-21AssemblyJune 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1264.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 782.) (April 19).
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51206.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code51206.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback