CA SB1349 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2080.2 and 2080.4 to, and to add and repeal Section 2080.3 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to endangered species.
Title
Endangered species: experimental populations: Chinook
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1349 Cogdill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1349 Cogdill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Cogdill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1349 Cogdill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Cogdill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4652.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3732.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3002.) | |
2010-03-10 | Set for hearing March 23. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |