CA SB1348 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 901, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 901, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 94934 of, and to add Section 88826.5 to, the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: allied health professional clinical programs: reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1348 Pan Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1348 Pan Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1348 Pan (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1348 Pan Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1348 Pan (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 901, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 6128.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 6975.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4354.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4309.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4533.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66026.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 84754.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88826.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |