CA SB1346 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 795, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 795, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16930 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: multiburst trigger activators.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1346 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GABRIEL (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1346 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1346 Jackson (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1346 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1346 Jackson (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 795, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 6170.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4940.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4819.) (April 24). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | April 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |