CA SB1339 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 8370) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: microgrids: tariffs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1339 Stern Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1339 Stern Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1339 Stern (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-28AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-28AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-28AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-08-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4353.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4308.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4718.) (April 17).
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code769Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback