CA SB1338 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2253 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-26 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 4. Page 3301.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3312.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 26 in B., P. & E.D. pending receipt. | |
2012-04-17 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-16 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 16. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | |
2012-03-27 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51087 | Amended Code | Citation Text |