CA SB1328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-13-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 7513.73 and 12327 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 16649.100) of Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to add and repeal Article 14 (commencing with Section 10495) of Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Prohibited investments and contracts: Russia and Belarus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1328 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and A. & A.R. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3972.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3792.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3169.) (March 21). |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R., G.O., and JUD. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12327 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7513.73 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10495 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |