CA SB1323 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-18 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-18 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2923.3, 2923.6, 2924, 2924.3, 2924.18, 2924a, 2924b, 2924c, 2924f, 2924g, 2924h, 2924k, and 2924m of the Civil Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
Foreclosure: equity sale: multiple listing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1323 Archuleta (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1323 Archuleta (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28). |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3918.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3596.) (May 3). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2923.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2923.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |