CA SB1321 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 664, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 42282 and 42283 of the Education Code, relating to school finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School finance: necessary small schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1321 Monning Senate Third Reading By CUNNINGHAM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1321 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 664, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6966.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4456.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4308.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4533.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code42282Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42283Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback