CA SB1311 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17206.2 to the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 116.540 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 401, 409, 409.3, 800, 802, and 804 of, and to add Section 408.1 to, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1311 Eggman et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1311 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1311 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1311 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1311 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5077.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5940.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3987.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3792.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3516.) (April 26). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3437.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17206.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 116.540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 408.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 409.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |