CA SB1311 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 889, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 889, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1808.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: confidential home address.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1311 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1311 Glazer (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1311 Glazer (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 889, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 3976.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3614.) (April 19). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1808.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |