CA SB1307 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to street lighting.
Title
Street lighting systems: City of Rosemead.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1307 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1307 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1307 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5280.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (May 11). |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |