CA SB1305 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25722.5, 25722.6, and 25722.7 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the state vehicle fleet.
Title
State vehicle fleet: alternative fuel vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Assembly - SB 1305 Laird Senate Third Reading By Boerner Horvath (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1305 Laird et al (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1305 Laird et al (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5713.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25722.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25722.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25722.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |