CA SB1305 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1799.109 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency medical services providers: dogs and cats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1305 Glazer et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24).
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4557.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH, B., P. & E.D., and JUD.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1799.109New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback