CA SB1305 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1799.109 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services providers.
Title
Emergency medical services providers: dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1305 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1305 Glazer Senate Third Reading By BAKER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1305 Glazer et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - ? (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1305 Glazer Senate Third Reading By BAKER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1305 Glazer et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - ? (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6982.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4464.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4557.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, B., P. & E.D., and JUD. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1799.109 | New Code | See Bill Text |