CA SB1304 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 170 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Property taxation: disaster relief: Porter Ranch methane gas leak.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 2)SB1 304 Huf f Urg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1304 Huff Third Reading Urgency By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 Huff Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1304 Huff Third Reading Urgency By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 Huff Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5527.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6364.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3977.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3836.) (May 11). |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |