CA SB1304 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 5.5 (commencing with Section 1508) to Division 2 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: leave and benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Asm. Warren Furutani [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1304 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 6754.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |
2010-06-10 | To Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3733.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-18 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-26 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3305.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3306.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-04-14 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-03-19 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2010-03-04 | To Coms. on L. & I.R. and RLS. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |