CA SB1303 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5450, 5451, and 5454 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to conservatorships.
Title
Conservatorships: serious mental illness and substance use disorders: counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |