CA SB1303 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


An act to amend Section 122405 of, and to add Section 122407 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Public health: hepatitis C.



2014-04-30SenateSet, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2014-04-22SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2014-04-21SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2014-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2014-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-02-24SenateRead first time.
2014-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code122405Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code122407New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code38000Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

Bill Comments