CA SB1302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26200 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: local jurisdiction: prohibitions on delivery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Lara. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4915.) (May 2). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26090 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |