CA SB1302 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10095.5 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 10095 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Basic property insurance: California FAIR Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1302 McGuire Urgency Clause Concurr (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1302 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By COOLEY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1302 McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1302 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By COOLEY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1302 McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5513.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6023.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3955.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 13). |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10095.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |