CA SB1300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12940 and 12965 of, and to add Sections 12923, 12950.2, and 12964.5 to, the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful employment practices: discrimination and harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1300 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1300 Jackson Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1300 Jackson (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 26).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-18AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5840.)
2018-06-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4459.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4308.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12923New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12941.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12950.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12950.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12964.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12965Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback