CA SB130 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 868.5 and 868.8 of the Penal Code, relating to witnesses.
Title
Witnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - SB 130 Corbett Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB130 Corbett (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB130 Corbett (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:15 p.m. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2109.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 711.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 467.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 868.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 868.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |