CA SB1299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-25 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-25 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 50495) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing development: incentives: rezoning of idle retail sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1299 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1299 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3818.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50495 | New Code | See Bill Text |