CA SB1299 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - May 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - May 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to tidelands.
Title
Tidelands: City of Huntington Beach: Huntington Harbor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4787.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |