CA SB1298 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53750 of the Government Code, relating to local government finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: fees and charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1298 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By GORDON Amend By GORDON Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1298 Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom Assembly without further action.
2016-11-30AssemblyDied on the inactive file.
2016-08-31AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2016-08-11AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5775.) Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29).
2016-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2016-06-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2016-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3955.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-05-06SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2016-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2016-03-29SenateApril 5 hearing postponed by committee.
2016-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2016-03-23SenateMarch 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2016-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
2016-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53750Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53755Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53756.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code846Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1298&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20160219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20160613_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20160801_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20160811_amended_asm_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20160419_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20160526_1055AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20160629_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20160811_0948AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback