CA SB1298 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 16.6 (commencing with Section 38750) to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: autonomous vehicles: safety and performance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1298 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1298 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1298 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By BLUMENFIELD Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1298 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2012-08-29 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4980.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-28 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-28 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 6459.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-24 Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6262.) Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-21 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-20 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-16 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2012-08-07 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-08-06 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2012-06-25 Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
2012-06-19 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-06-18 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-06-04 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-05-21 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-21 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3555.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-16 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-15 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2012-05-04 Set for hearing May 14.
2012-04-19 Re-referred to Com. on INS. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-16 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-04-12 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3123.) (April 10).
2012-04-09 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-03-27 Set for hearing April 10.
2012-03-20 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-03-09 Set for hearing March 27.
2012-03-08 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-02-24 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2012-02-23 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code38750New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1298&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120409_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120416_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120619_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120807_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120820_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120824_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_bill_20120925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120410_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120521_0146PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120702_000006_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120816_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120824_1129AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120828_0323PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1298_vote_20120829_0742PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback