CA SB1295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1679.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to voter registration.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles: voter registration: kiosks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E. & C.A. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1679.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1295 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1295 |