CA SB1294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 23 (commencing with Section 26240) to Division 10 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Cannabis: state and local equity programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1294 Bradford Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1294 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1294 Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1294 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1294 Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 6175.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16). |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4352.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26051.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26240 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 5056 | Amended Code | Citation Text |