CA SB1294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26051.5 of, to add Section 26051.7 to, and to add Chapter 23 (commencing with Section 26240) to Division 10 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: state and local equity programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1294 Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4352.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-05SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback