CA SB1294 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3234.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9050, 9051, 9053, 9086, 9087, 13262, 13282, and 18602 of the Elections Code, and to amend Section 88002 of the Government Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: ballot titles and summaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-22 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22SenateSet, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3234.) Reconsideration granted.
2014-04-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2014-03-25SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 1.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-02-24SenateRead first time.
2014-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback