CA SB1294 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3234.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3234.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9050, 9051, 9053, 9086, 9087, 13262, 13282, and 18602 of the Elections Code, and to amend Section 88002 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: ballot titles and summaries.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3234.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13262 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9053 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9086 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9087 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 88002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |