CA SB1293 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8546.10 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State Auditor: high-risk local government agency audit program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1293 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1293 Lara Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1293 Lara (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6596.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Obernolte.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4223.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8546.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5019.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback