CA SB1291 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Set for hearing May 25.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1722, 1751.5, 14000, 14020, 14022, 14022.5, 14028, 14031, 14032, 14039, 14042, 14050, 14080, 14090.1, 14097, and 14099 of, to amend and repeal Sections 14030 and 14037 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 14029, 14038, 14040, 14061, 14063, and 14064 of, to add Sections 14025.1, 14046, 14079, and 14090.3 to, to add and repeal Section 14097.5 of, to repeal Section 14027 of, and to repeal and add Sections 14001, 14010, 14021, 14024, 14025, 14026, and 14078 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Independent insurance adjusters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 25).
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-10SenateApril 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code14000Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14020Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14022Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14022.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14028Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14029New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14030Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14031Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14032Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14037Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14038New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14039Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14040New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14042Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14050Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14061New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14063New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14064New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14080Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14090.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14097Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14099Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1722Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1751.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback