CA SB1291 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14717.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: specialty mental health: minor and nonminor dependents.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1291 Beall Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1291 Beall Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1291 Beall Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5452.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5921.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4141.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4007.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 12). |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12 in HUMAN S. pending receipt. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14717.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14717.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |