CA SB1291 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9063.9 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public cemetery districts.
Title
Public cemetery districts: Halcumb Cemetery District.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1291 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 276, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3072.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3037.) (April 2). |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 9063.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |