CA SB1285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 4853.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 4853.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.44 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10123.204 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.09 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: advanced practice pharmacist.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-25-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-25-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 4853.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |