CA SB1284 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to human remains.
Title
Human remains: conservator of the person or estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1284 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1284 Hernandez (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1284 Hernandez (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5403.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3463.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 7105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |