CA SB128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 501, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 20155, 20155.1, 20155.7, and 20155.9 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: Best Value Construction Contracting for Counties Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB128 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 128 Beall Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB128 Beall et al (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 501, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2437.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-28SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2313.)
2019-08-28SenateSet for hearing August 28.
2019-08-26SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2262.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-08-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2019-08-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2806.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-03-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-03-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 476.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20).
2019-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53398.58Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.63Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.66Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.67Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.69Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.77Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.78Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.79Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.80Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.81Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.82Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.88Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code20155Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code20155.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code20155.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code20155.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback