CA SB128 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) to Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to end of life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End of life.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB128 Wolk (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom Assembly without further action.
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2015-07-07AssemblyJuly 7 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-23AssemblyJune 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2015-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-06-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-11SenateMay 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 11.
2015-04-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 525.) (April 7).
2015-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2015-03-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 434.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2015-01-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
2015-01-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code443New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_128&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20150120_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20150317_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20150414_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20150616_amended_asm_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20150325_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20150407_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20150511_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20150604_0240PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback