CA SB1274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4514 of, and to add Section 10850.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: data exchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1274 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1274 McGuire Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1274 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1274 McGuire Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1274 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5693.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6481.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and P. & C.P. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10850.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |