CA SB1273 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32210 and 48902 of, and to repeal Section 44014 of, the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: mandatory notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1273 Bradford (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1273 Bradford Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1273 Bradford (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [03-31-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [03-30-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1273 Bradford (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1273 Bradford Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1273 Bradford (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [03-31-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [03-30-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3971.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3841.) |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Bradford. |
2022-05-23 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 3841.) | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3519.) (April 26). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3348.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | March 30 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3272.) Reconsideration granted. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32210 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44014 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |