CA SB1272 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to submit an advisory question to the voters relating to campaign finance, calling an election, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance: advisory election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1272 Lieu (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Assembly - SB 1272 Lieu Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - SB 1272 Lieu Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS Amend By WILLIAMS Set #1 (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1272 Lieu (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2014.
2014-07-15 Became law without Governor's signature.
2014-07-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
2014-07-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4251.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-06-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2014-06-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5744.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-06-26AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 5702.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 18).
2014-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3655.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-05-27SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3713.) (May 23).
2014-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2014-05-05SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 5.
2014-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2014-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-02-24SenateRead first time.
2014-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code8601Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1272&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140328_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140408_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140430_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140527_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140626_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140707_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_bill_20140722_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140422_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140505_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140523_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140528_0420PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140610_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140618_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140626_0955AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140630_0132PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1272_vote_20140703_1245PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback