CA SB1270 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31522.3 of the Government Code, relating to county employees’ retirement.
Title
County employees’ retirement: system personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Assembly - SB 1270 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1270 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1270 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | June 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4605.) (April 9). |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31522.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |