CA SB127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14526.4 and 14526.6 of, and to add Section 14526.8 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 167 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation funding: active transportation: complete streets.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB127 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 127 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Boerner Horvath (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB127 Wiener et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 127 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Boerner Horvath (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB127 Wiener et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2846.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 3329.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1089.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 804.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14526.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |