CA SB1267 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1962 and 1962.7 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1161 and 1162 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 7060.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Rent: unlawful detainer: withdrawal of accommodations from rent or lease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 8). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1962.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7060.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50199.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |