CA SB1265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51938 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Comprehensive sexual health education and human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) prevention education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51938 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1265 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1265 |